HI SB1378 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to provide tuition free classes at the Hawaiian language college to high school students. Requires the pilot program to be designed, implemented, and operated by the Hawaiian language college and initiated at a laboratory school program within reasonable proximity to the Hawaiian language college.
Title
Hawaiian Language College; Pilot Program for Advanced Placement Classes Taught in the Hawaiian Language
Sponsors
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HEA, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1224 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN/HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1378&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1378_.HTM |