HI SB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 241, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 241, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds campaign spending report filing deadlines of April 30 and October 1 of a general election year for candidates and candidate committees. (SB138 HD1)
Title
Relating To Reports Of Candidate Committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 241, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 241, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 914). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-19. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 573). |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Deferred one day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4). |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1916) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 775) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB163 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JDC.