HI SB140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB140
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidates who do not intend to receive or spend more than $1,000 in an election period to notify the Campaign Spending Commission of this intention by 6/30 of an election year, and noncandidate committees that do not intend to receive or spend more than $1,000 in an election period to notify the Commission of this intention by the 5th day before the due date of the preliminary primary report.
Title
Relating To Campaign Reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Candidate Committees
Contributions and Expenditures
Final Election Period Report
Hawaii Campaign Spending Commission Package
Noncandidate Committees
Organizational Report
Contributions and Expenditures
Final Election Period Report
Hawaii Campaign Spending Commission Package
Noncandidate Committees
Organizational Report
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=140&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB140_.HTM |