HI SB1415 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1415
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) La Chica voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) La Chica voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to submit annual reports of all university employees who performed work from a location outside of the State during the applicable year to the legislature no later than December 31 of that year. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) La Chica voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1496) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) La Chica; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd, Woodson, Garcia. |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 441) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HRE/LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1415 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) La Chica voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).