HI SB1436 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN/HOU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN/HOU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts affordable housing and certain qualifying housing development projects from HEPA. Establishes a definition of "program" and "project" to preempt the existing definitions under section 11-200.1-2, Hawaii Administrative Rules, and narrow the existing interpretation that requires analysis of tangentially related projects. Amends the applicability and requirements section of HEPA to clarify when multiple actions must be considered in the same environmental review document for the purposes of project segmentation. Expands the requirement that project opponents must exhaust their administrative remedies as a prerequisite to litigation to apply to environmental assessments and environmental impact statements. Retroactively applies to projects that received approval for their environmental assessment or environmental impact statement on or after August 9, 2019.
Title
Relating To Development Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HOU, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1436 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN/HOU, JDC.
HB1247 (Same As) 2023-02-03 - The committee(s) on HSG/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1247 (Same As) 2023-02-03 - The committee(s) on HSG/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Hawaii Environmental Policy Act
Project Segmentation
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Hawaii Environmental Policy Act
Project Segmentation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1436&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1436_.HTM |