HI SB1446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the administrator of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to receive approval from the board for appointments of the chief financial officer, director of human resources, and attorney. Provides the board the option of having a direct supervisory role over the chief financial officer, director of human resources, and attorney. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1446 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Attorney
Board of Trustees
Chief Financial Officer
Director of Human Resources
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Supervision
Board of Trustees
Chief Financial Officer
Director of Human Resources
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Supervision