HI SB1479 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an income tax credit to qualified taxpayers for the installation of clean energy storage systems. Defines "clean energy storage system". Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2011. (SD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Energy Storage Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |