HI SB1501 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1501
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Board of Land and Natural Resources from disturbing or acquiring for development certain wetland tarogrowing lands. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Protection Of Taro Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC . |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1501 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.