HI SB1521 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes contract, cost disclosure, reimbursement, appeals, and information protection requirements for pharmacy benefit managers that contract with small, independent, and isolated pharmacies. Establishes enforcement jurisdiction in the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. (SB1521 HD1)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1521 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB1442 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
HB1442 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).