HI SB1553 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent statutory provisions that: (1) reduced the maximum employment period for teachers hired on an emergency basis by DOE from 4 years to 3 years; and (2) require those unlicensed teachers hired on an emergency basis prior to 7/1/08, to attain licensure within 4 years from the date of employment. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
DOE; Emergency Hires; Teacher Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |