HI SB158 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the governor to establish puuhonua safe zones where homeless persons may reside. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=158&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB158_.HTM |