HI SB1588 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 212, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 212, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture to establish and implement a GroupGAP food safety training and certification program. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 212, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 212, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 187) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 187). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, La Chica. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Aquino, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 2:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 11:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Kapela, La Chica, Ward. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Richards. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 796). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos. |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-17-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1350 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
Certification
DOA
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Food Safety Modernization Act
GroupGAP
Training
U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Certification
DOA
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Food Safety Modernization Act
GroupGAP
Training
U.S. Food and Drug Administration