HI SB1606 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for registration of real estate appraisal management companies with the real estate commission of the department of commerce and consumer affairs. Establishes standards and violations.
Title
Real Estate Appraisals; Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Sakamoto. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1577 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.