HI SB173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation and the counties to implement a Vision Zero program in Hawaii by 7/1/2024. Establishes a goal of no traffic fatalities or serious injuries by 2045.
Title
Relating To Vision Zero.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB173 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Re-Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=173&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB173_.HTM |