HI SB178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education, in a partnership with the department of health, to establish a three-year food waste recycling pilot project in one or more public schools. Allows departments to enter into public/private partnerships to establish and operate the pilot program. Appropriates funds for the pilot program. Takes effect July 1, 2020. (SB178 HD1)
Title
Food Waste Recycling; Solid Waste; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 3:00 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-09 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Takumi, Morita, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Coffman, Ching. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Sakamoto, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Hooser, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Morita, Souki, Takai excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1648) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-09 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Har, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-24-09 9:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2009-03-18 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Hanohano, Manahan, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Yamane. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-18-09 3:00pm in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EDN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Reported from ENE/EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green, Hooser. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH-ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to ENE/EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |