HI SB185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places a moratorium on any new solid waste landfills and the expansion of any existing private solid waste landfills on the leeward coast from Kaena point to Waimanalo gulch on or after 8/1/11.
Title
Waianae Coast Landfills; Moratorium
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 4:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM/ENE. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=185 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB185_.HTM |