HI SB185 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2019, requires child care providers licensed or registered by the Department of Human Services to obtain and maintain liability insurance coverage. (SB185 HD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care Providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Takumi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Har, Ing, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Tupola excused (8). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-03-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-17-17 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - The conference committee deferred the measure.