HI SB20 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the law with respect to assault against a law enforcement officer.
Title
Crimes; Assault
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=20&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB20_.HTM |