HI SB2001 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows surviving immediate family members of deceased persons where law enforcement initiated an investigation to receive a copy of the closing report prepared by the investigating police department after a specified period of time. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Police Reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |