HI SB203 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Act 118, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Act 118, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Campaign Spending Commission to treat a respondent's failure to explain or otherwise respond to a complaint alleging a violation of campaign spending laws as a rebuttable presumption that a violation has occurred. Provides the respondent with thirty days from the mailing of the complaint to explain or otherwise respond before the rebuttable presumption takes effect. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Complaints Alleging Violations Of Campaign Spending Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Senate | Act 118, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2023-06-23 | House | Act 118, on 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5). |
2023-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza. |
2023-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Gabbard. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 535). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Deferred one day 04-03-23. |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Mizuno. |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-15-23. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB98 (Same As) 2023-02-01 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.