HI SB2039 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources at the University of Hawaii for its cooperative extension service. Effective July 1, 2525. (SB2039 HD1)
Title
College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources at the University of Hawaii; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Nishihara, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Ruderman, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Choy, Onishi Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Wooley, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 526). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1611-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Hashem, Woodson, Ward. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (5). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1065-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Awana, Hanohano, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ohno, Say, Takai. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-13-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 87). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2558) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2093) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Wakai. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AGL, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |