HI SB2052 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a rule of evidence to exclude the admissibility of medical apologies to prove liability. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Medical Apology; Rules of Evidence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2450 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7