HI SB2055 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to provide written notice to the Senate within a certain time period during the regular legislative session of the name of any gubernatorial nominee for an executive branch position that is subject to the Senate's advice and consent. (SB2055 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Executive Branch.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2018-02-21 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 27). |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-20-18. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2521) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |