HI SB206 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2014-2015 as a subsidy for Hawaii health systems corporation for employment costs.
Title
Hawaii Heath Systems; Collective Bargaining Cost Items; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 9:20AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB677 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=206&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB206_.HTM |