HI SB206 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination, including in advertisements for available real property, based on participation in a housing assistance program or requirements related to participation in housing assistance programs, in real estate transactions and requirements. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Rental Discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB206 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB1390 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1390 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.