HI SB2085 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 209, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 209, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of the State Fire Marshal within the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to be headed by a State Fire Marshal. Exempts the State Fire Marshal from Civil Service Law. Requires the State Fire Council to establish the terms of employment for the State Fire Marshal and appoint the State Fire Marshal to serve for a term of five years. Requires the State Fire Council to report to the Legislature. Makes appropriations. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Fire Marshal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Act 209, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2024-07-08 | House | Act 209, on 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 177-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 177-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Kila, M. Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Wakai, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:00AM; CR 016. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791). |
2024-04-19 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Kila, M. Mizuno, Souza. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Wakai, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 552). |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1768-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from WAL/LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/LGO on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LBT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to LBT/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1550 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1