HI SB2087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to conduct a study on wildfire risk and insurance and submit a report regarding the study to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2025.
Title
Relating To Wildfire Risk And Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1549 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2087&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2087_.HTM |