HI SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB21
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases monetary penalties for violating the laws relating to child care facilities. Authorizes the Department of Human Services to refer to the Attorney General or respective county police department any intentional, knowing, or reckless violation of the laws relating to child care facilities or certain criminal offenses. (SB21 HD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1255) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 73) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB21 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).