HI SB2109 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 2:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 2:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a program for granting low-income housing tax credit loans in lieu of low-income housing tax credits administered by the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation. Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds to fund the loans. Applies to qualified low-income buildings placed in service after December 31, 2010. Effective July 1, 2020. (SB2109 HD1)
Title
Low-Income Housing Tax Credits; Grant Exchange Program
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-10 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-10 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Cabanilla, Chong, Sagum, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Sakamoto, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Kidani, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Deferred until 04-07-10. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317). | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai, Thielen excused (2). | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083-10) as amended in HD1 , recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Sagum, Tokioka. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-26-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2594) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2054) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |