HI SB2109 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Until 6/30/2025, exempts from the offense of unlawful shipment of tobacco products the shipments of large cigars and pipe tobacco sold to a consumer in the State through the Internet under certain circumstances. Defines "pipe tobacco". Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Unlawful Shipment Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2623) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |