HI SB2110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expedites the construction of affordable housing units by requiring ministerial permits associated with the project to be issued by the state or county within sixty days of receipt of a permit application deemed to be complete by the receiving state or county agency. (SB2110 HD1)
Title
Affordable Housing; Sixty-Day Review
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from HSG/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Luke; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Morita; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Luke; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Morita; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WLO on Wednesday, 03-17-10 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, JUD, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2425) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from EDH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH/TIA, WTL. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |