HI SB2112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and makes an appropriation to complete construction on the senior residence at Iwilei, Oahu.
Title
Senior Residence at Iwilei; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) Reported from EDH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tsutsui ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-10 2:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH/HMS, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |