HI SB2125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BLNR to convene a task force to assist DLNR in developing rules to establish a marine life conservation district to ensure greater protection of the State's ocean resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD3)
Title
DLNR; Marine Life Conservation District; Task Force; Niihau
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 388) in amended form (SD 3). |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-14. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report filed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 4 offered. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Hee, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1921 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.