HI SB2147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2026, requires nonpotable water users and developers of real property adjacent to or within reach of existing suitable infrastructure connected to a wastewater recycling facility that treats wastewater to R-1 standards to use R-1 water. Establishes positions. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Reuse Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2384) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |