HI SB2149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to approve or deny an application related to aquaculture within 90 days from the date that it was submitted. Establishes two full-time equivalent (2.0 FTE) positions within the Division of Aquatic Resources to support the permit review process. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2380) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Aquaculture Permit
Aquatic Research
Commercial License
DAR
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions
Aquaculture Permit
Aquatic Research
Commercial License
DAR
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions