HI SB2152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state-licensed and credentialed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, and physician assistants, who are not physically in the State, to issue prescriptions for certain controlled substances under a limited circumstance. Authorizes pharmacies to dispense such prescriptions.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2152&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2152_.HTM |