HI SB2156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 5:05pm in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 5:05pm in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to enter into the Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact or similar agreement for mutual assistance in the enforcement of wildlife laws. Requires the DLNR Division of Aquatic Resources to conduct a statewide science based assessment of its ocean resources. Appropriates funds. (SB2156 HD3)
Title
Wildlife; DLNR; Multi-jurisdictional Agreement; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 5:05pm in conference room 224. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ing, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1239-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong excused (1). |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Say. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-14-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 112) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |