HI SB2157 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2025, requires rental kayaks to be registered and numbered with the Department of Land and Natural Resources and have the identification number affixed to the rental kayak. Requires the Department to establish fees for registration and registration renewal of rental kayaks.
Title
Relating To Vessels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-14-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2157&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2157_.HTM |