HI SB2172 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - (S) Act 79, 5/5/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 537).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - (S) Act 79, 5/5/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 537).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for Kaimuki Christian School. Effective July 1, 2010. (SB2172 HD1)
Title
SPRB; Kaimuki Christian School
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | (S) Act 79, 5/5/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 537). | |
2010-05-05 | (H) Act 079, on 5/5/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 291). | |
2010-04-30 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-10 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Marumoto. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 343). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Keith-Agaran, Wooley. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Takumi, Berg, Chang, Hanohano, Manahan, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Bertram, Pine. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-09-10 2:30PM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2588) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2027) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |