HI SB2181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to increase the hourly fees, mileage reimbursement rate, and commuter-time compensation rate for court interpreters. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Court Interpreters.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2126) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Commuter Compensation Rate
Court Interpreters
Expenditure Ceiling
Hourly Fees
Judiciary
Mileage Reimbursement Rate
Commuter Compensation Rate
Court Interpreters
Expenditure Ceiling
Hourly Fees
Judiciary
Mileage Reimbursement Rate