HI SB2185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - This measure has been deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - This measure has been deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes violations of privacy in the first degree and certain violations of privacy in the second degree, from qualifying for deferred acceptance of a guilty plea or nolo contendere plea. Limits the government use of facial recognition systems, except in certain circumstances. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | This measure has been deferred. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 391). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Nakamura excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-07-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say. |
2020-06-26 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-20 at 2:01PM. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-12-20 at 2:30 PM. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2952) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-06-20 10:01AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1745 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.