HI SB2187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the Labor Education Advisory Council shall be advisory to the President of the University of Hawaii on all activities and programs of the Center for Labor Education and Research. Requires written responses addressing the Council's advice and adoption of resolutions by the President and Chancellor of the University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Labor Education Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1588 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to HRE, WAM.