HI SB2195 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of public safety to annually submit to the legislature and post on the department of public safety's public website reports on misconduct incidents that resulted in suspension or discharge of an employee having police powers. Expands the scope of the required county police chiefs' annual reports regarding misconduct of police officers to include misconduct of employees having police powers. Requires the county police chiefs' annual reports to be posted on the respective county police department's public website. (SD1)
Title
Department of Public Safety; County Police Department; Misconduct Incident Report
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2091) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |