HI SB221 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires commission on salaries to conduct a public hearing on Oahu prior to submitting its recommendations to the legislature.
Title
Commission on Salaries; Public Hearing
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=221&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB221_.HTM |