HI SB223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates marijuana distribution stamp system for medical marijuana in Hawaii. Requires a certified facilitator to purchase stamps, at no more than 50 cents per gram of marijuana, for a qualifying patient. Allows a secure growing facility to grow marijuana for no more than 14 qualifying patients. Sets standards for secure growing facility.
Title
Medical Marijuana; Distribution System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=223&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB223_.HTM |