HI SB2232 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new chapter in the Hawaii Revised Statutes regulating peer-to-peer vehicle sharing in Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Peer-to-peer Vehicle Sharing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 12:00PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2232&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2232_.HTM |