HI SB2239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the offices of the prosecuting attorney of the respective counties to collect and publish certain data relating to criminal defendants and prosecutorial decision-making. Requires governor to establish a prosecutorial transparency advisory board.
Title
Relating To Prosecutorial Transparency.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2749 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Subjects
Advisory Board
Criminal Justice Research Institute
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Prosecutorial Transparency
Reporting Requirements
Criminal Justice Research Institute
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Prosecutorial Transparency
Reporting Requirements
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2239&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2239_.HTM |