HI SB2239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police departments from acquiring certain types of military equipment and using certain types of equipment on protesters and demonstrators.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |