HI SB2246 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of public safety, sheriff division, to randomly inspect shipping containers for dangerous materials, including explosives but excluding fireworks. Effective 7/1/2013.
Title
Harbors; Inspection of Shipping Containers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2246 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2246_.HTM |