HI SB225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition of "residency" to rules for determining residency. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Elections; Residency
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 96) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |